Financial history HEYMANN SUPPORT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1060408
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £7.12k £3.98k £150 £1.53k £4.29k
Total expenditure £5.68k £10.80k £1.20k £0 £1.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A