PENINSULA MEDICAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raises vital funds for medical research and support to students at the University of Plymouth Peninsula Schools of Medicine and Dentistry and the wider healthcare community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cornwall
- Devon
Governance
- 28 January 1997: Standard registration
- PENINSULA FOUNDATION (Working name)
- PENINSULA COLLEGE OF MEDICINE AND DENTISTRY FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- PENINSULA MEDICAL SCHOOL FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- SOUTH WEST MEDICAL RESEARCH FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- THE PLYMOUTH AND SOUTH WEST MEDICAL RESEARCH FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr JOHN ADRIAN COPPLESTONE | Chair | 17 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sophia Ruth Wrigley | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Edward Martin Brooke | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Peter Cyril Whitfield | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Prof. Christopher Terence Lewis MBE FRCS | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Peter Graham Vosper | Trustee | 22 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £103.85k | £14.24k | £463.71k | £89.00k | £106.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120.22k | £16.01k | £206.97k | £101.50k | £38.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 20 January 2022 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 11 December 2020 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 11 December 2020 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/01/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/07/2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 05/03/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/06/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15/03/2013
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS GENERALLY AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO SUPPORT AND PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, ALL ASPECTS OF RESEARCH AND EDUCATION IN MEDICINE AND HEALTHCARE AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. IN FURTHERANCE (SEE MEM & ARTS)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Metherell Gard
Old Memorial hall
Morval
LOOE
Cornwall
PL13 1PN
- Phone:
- 07531898272
- Website:
-
peninsulamedicalfoundation.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window