UPTON SNODSBURY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1060426
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide a Village Hall for the use of the inhabitants of Upton Snodsbury

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £4,706
Total expenditure: £4,234

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 January 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • UPTON SNODBURY VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Paying staff
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alastair Kennedy Findlay Chair 27 April 2018
None on record
Celia Tracey Young Trustee 17 May 2019
None on record
ERIC ALLEN WILES Trustee 17 May 2019
FRIENDS OF ST KENELM'S CHURCH UPTON SNODSBURY
Received: On time
WORCESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LIMITED
Received: On time
Rachel Macefield Trustee 30 June 2018
FRIENDS ASSOCIATION OF UPTON SNODSBURY SCHOOL
Received: On time
CATHERINE ZOE MILNER CENG Trustee
FRIENDS OF ST KENELM'S CHURCH UPTON SNODSBURY
Received: On time
CAROLE ANNE DOCWRA WILES BA HONS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.94k £11.66k £1.45k £6.31k £4.71k
Total expenditure £4.12k £2.37k £2.39k £11.87k £4.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE VILLAGE HALL
UPTON SNODSBURY
WORCESTER
WR7 4NH
Phone:
01905381270
Website:

No information available