Trustees THE COLLEGE OF OPTOMETRISTS
Charity number: 1060431

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hassnain Safdar MCOptom | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Joy Myint FCOptom | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Trimmer MCOptom | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matt Roney | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Aleksandra Mankowska | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Kathryn Saunders FCOptomPhD | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Irene Ctori | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kyla Black | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Redhead | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gillian Anne Rudduck | Trustee | 20 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Leon Nicholas Davies | Trustee | 14 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Kitchen | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.