WILDLIFE RESCUE AND AMBULANCE SERVICE (ENFIELD)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rescue & rehabilitation of wild animals and birds. Gives work experience to youngsters & offers voluntary work to all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
- Throughout London
Governance
- 31 January 1997: Standard registration
- 09 September 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 02 November 2011: Re-registered
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARRY KEITH SMITHERMAN MBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
June Dorothy Smitherman mbe | Trustee | 20 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH ANNE CLARKE | Trustee | 17 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Barry Smitherman MBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £124.61k | £254.15k | £147.49k | £218.78k | £205.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £161.61k | £150.02k | £175.11k | £202.20k | £218.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 November 2024 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 December 2024 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 December 2024 | 399 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2021
(These accounts |
22 February 2023 | 114 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 November 2021 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 December 2021 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 January 2021 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 January 2021 | 69 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6TH NOVEMBER 1996, AND AMENDED 29TH DECEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE ANIMALS THAT ARE IN NEED DUE TO BEING INJURED, TRAPPED, SICK, ORPHANED OR ABANDONED, IN PARTICULAR BY: (1) THE PROVISION OF A RESCUE SERVICE. (2) TREATING INJURED WILDLIFE WHERE POSSIBLE AND TRANSPORTING TO A WILDLIFE HOSPITAL WHERE NECESSARY (3) RETURNING (WHERE POSSIBLE) ALL TREATED ANIMALS TO THE WILD OR ARRANGING PERMANENT ACCOMMODATION WHERE RELEASE IS NOT POSSIBLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
trent park animal centre
cockfosters road
barnet
herts
EN4 0PS
- Phone:
- 0202883442785
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window