Financial history THE KEIGHLEY BUS MUSEUM TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1060457
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £64.17k £70.46k £98.26k £136.51k £84.64k
Total expenditure £61.27k £67.92k £77.78k £106.00k £82.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A