Governing document THE KEIGHLEY BUS MUSEUM TRUST LIMITED

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 AUGUST 1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 1 DECEMBER 1996 AND 3 JULY 1997. FURTHER AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 28 MAY 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 MAY 2017 as amended on 02 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC BY ESTABLISHING WITHIN THE KEIGHLEY AND AIRE VALLEY AREA OF WEST YORKSHIRE ONE OR MORE OPERATIONAL OR STATIC MUSEUMS OF TRANSPORT HISTORY AND ARCHAELOGY COVERING ALL ASPECTS OF ROAD PUBLIC PASSENGER TRANSPORT
Area of benefit
KEIGHLEY AND AIRE VALLEY AREAS OF WEST YORKSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.