Financial history WHITEHAVEN MUSICAL FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1060475
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £334 £0 £3.72k £4.39k £5.23k
Total expenditure £373 £160 £3.96k £5.07k £4.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A