Trustees GREENSLEEVES HOMES TRUST

Charity Number: 1060478
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kevin Andrew Richmond Chair 28 November 2024
SUE RYDER
Received: On time
COIF CHARITIES INVESTMENT FUND
Charity is a Common Investment Fund
COIF CHARITIES SHORT DURATION BOND FUND
Charity is a Common Investment Fund
COIF CHARITIES ETHICAL INVESTMENT FUND
Charity is a Common Investment Fund
COIF CHARITIES DEPOSIT FUND
Charity is a Common Deposit Fund
COIF CHARITIES GLOBAL EQUITY FUND
Charity is a Common Investment Fund
COIF CHARITIES PROPERTY FUND
Charity is a Common Investment Fund
Antony Christie Trustee 16 May 2024
None on record
Michael Edward Lowe Trustee 16 May 2024
None on record
Andrea Louise Willimott Trustee 16 November 2023
None on record
Angela Morris Trustee 16 November 2023
None on record
Dennis Bryan Trustee 19 May 2022
None on record
Maria Brigid Townson Trustee 21 November 2018
None on record
PATRICK CHARLES GORDON SPENCE Trustee 17 May 2018
None on record