Accounts and annual returns PETER PAN PRE-SCHOOL BRAMCOTE (MOD)

Charity number: 1060518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 04 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 04 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 22 March 2024 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 22 March 2024 51 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 March 2023 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 March 2023 55 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 March 2022 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 March 2022 56 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 March 2021 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 March 2021 33 days late Download Open in new window