Financial history JESSE GRAY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1060521
Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £59.19k £58.61k £40.02k £71.07k £53.87k
Total expenditure £53.96k £63.70k £40.02k £68.22k £68.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A