LANGLEY MILL JUNIOR SCHOOL P.T.A.

Charity Number: 1060562
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 February 1997: Standard registration
  • 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other names:
  • LANGLEY MILL JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 October 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 01 October 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 01 October 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 01 October 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 01 October 2004 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2004 Not submitted