HOSPICE INCOME GENERATION NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing the education and training of fundraisers in the hospice movement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 06 February 1997: Standard registration
- NAHF (Working name)
- THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOSPICE FUNDRAISERS LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Patricia Ketola | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Marie Cox | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Pink | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Augusta Akoto Adu | Trustee | 04 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Anne Nightingale | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Thomas David Abbott | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
David McFadden | Trustee | 18 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.09k | £88.47k | £31.69k | £63.14k | £66.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.50k | £79.98k | £37.42k | £43.35k | £34.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 OCTOBER 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14 FEBRUARY 1997 as amended on 27 Apr 2020 as amended on 29 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
The objects for which the Charity is established are to advance the education of and training of income generation, retail and marketing professionals in the hospice movement, in order to maintain and improve professional standards of fundraising, and to support the work of charitable hospices providing for the care of the dying. Nothing in the Articles shall authorise an application of the property of the Charity for purposes which are not charitable in accordance with section 7 of the Charities and Trustee Investment (Scotland) Act 2005 and/or section 2 of the Charities Act (Northern Ireland) 2008.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Blue Swift Accountants
37 Riverside House
River Lawn Road
Tonbridge
Kent
TN9 1EP
- Phone:
- 01732 783539
- Email:
- chair@hospice-ign.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window