CLIPSTON SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1060575
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fund Raising

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £9,550
Total expenditure: £4,860

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 February 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Katie Victoria Dullaghan Trustee 02 October 2024
None on record
Rose Clementine O'Connor Trustee 02 October 2024
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.83k £3.30k £4.65k £6.16k £9.55k
Total expenditure £2.85k £3.57k £2.54k £5.70k £4.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 10 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 19 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 06 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Clipston Endowed Controlled Primary School
High Street
Clipston
MARKET HARBOROUGH
LE16 9RU
Phone:
07812005563
Website:

No information available