Accounts and annual returns MEDIATION CORNWALL

Charity number: 1060611
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2006 23 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 15 March 2006 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 15 March 2006 43 days late
Annual return 31 March 2004 28 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 28 January 2005 On Time