Financial history SAMANTHA DICKSON BRAIN TUMOUR TRUST

Charity number: 1060627
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £614.28k £485.74k £839.13k £932.65k £1.26m
Total expenditure £425.07k £251.95k £535.37k £703.14k £1.09m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £892.97k £1.18m
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £39.69k £72.19k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £563.93k £900.62k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £55.38k £24.33k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0