Financial history FRIENDS AND ASSOCIATES OF DENTON SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1060635
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £3.87k £2.62k £3.39k £5.31k £6.01k
Total expenditure £5.05k £1.44k £2.27k £2.30k £4.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A