ST DAY YOUTH AND SPORTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing sport for the community and use of hall for various community events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
54 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 11 February 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Leah | Chair | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clive Jones | Trustee | 29 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
MISTER ADRIAN WALTERS | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
MISTER TONY MITCHELL | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.97k | £40.78k | £26.01k | £87.63k | £59.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.74k | £37.65k | £16.27k | £90.04k | £79.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £16.10k | £47.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 NOVEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED 6 FEBRUARY 1997 AND 13 JULY 2000
Charitable objects
1-TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS OF ST DAY, WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THE YOUTH THEREOF; AND 2-TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONGST THE YOUTH AND UNEMPLOYED PERSONS IN THE SAID AREA IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING.
Area of benefit
ST DAY
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Day Enterprise Centre
Vogue Hill
St. Day
Redruth
Cornwall
TR16 5NQ
- Phone:
- 01209822536
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window