BREADLINE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Breadline facilitates and empowers churches and local charities in Eastern Europe to develop and implement a range of projects which have a transformational impact on the poor communities they serve, including community development, protecting children at risk, education, advocacy for the disabled and family welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Moldova
Governance
- 11 February 1997: Standard registration
- 17 June 2024: Funds received from 1100123 MISSION MOLDOVA
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Johnson | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Burch | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Glenn William Tyrone Henry | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Esther Ruth Kenney | Trustee | 12 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Kenney | Trustee | 12 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Lanyon | Trustee | 12 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carol Feben | Trustee | 10 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL SAMWAYS | Trustee | 04 February 2017 |
|
|||||
IAN HAMES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £245.83k | £236.56k | £223.67k | £451.38k | £244.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £189.61k | £239.58k | £208.30k | £382.95k | £298.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/01/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/09/2012
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE COUNTRIES OF EASTERN EUROPE AND IN SUCH OTHER PLACES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. (SEE GI FOR FULL DETAILS)
Area of benefit
EASTERN EUROPE AND SUCH OTHER AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
157 London Road
KETTERING
NN15 6NQ
- Phone:
- 01536515756
- Email:
- RMSAMWAYS@YAHOO.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window