Governing document N A A C E

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 OCTOBER 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS 15 OCTOBER 2003, 3 MARCH 2005, 30 SEPTEMBER 2005, 28 SEPTEMBER 2007 AND 17 MAY 2008 as amended on 05 Feb 2020 as amended on 05 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
4. The Charity's objects ("the Objects") are: 4.1. to advance education through encouraging the appropriate and effective use of education technology and to offer support to those engaged in related activities; and 4.2. to promote such other charitable purposes as the Board of Management may from time to time determine.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.