AFGHAN ASSOCIATION OF LONDON (HARROW)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Association was established in 1995 to assist refugees with their integration into UK society. As a centre point for the community, the Association provides a wide range of support and advice. The Association has assisted thousands of refugees to successfully integrate into the UK society. Key activities and services; Information and Advice, Women and elderly groups, youth and sport.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 13 February 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sayed Abdul Hadi Sadat | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Zarghoons Sultanpury | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Abdul Sharifi | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Khadija Azada | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abdul Wali Zalmai | Trustee | 02 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
NOOR MOHAMMAD SULTANI | Trustee | 10 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.92k | £73.66k | £118.99k | £121.48k | £129.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.27k | £47.96k | £83.29k | £120.88k | £127.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 99 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23RD SEPTEMBER 1996, AND AMENDED 29TH OCTOBER 1996
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST THE AFGHAN COMMUNITY IN THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF HARROW, BRENT, AND EALING PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF AN ADVICE AND INTERPRETING SERVICE. 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONGST THE AFGHAN COMMUNITY IN THE SAME AREAS, PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF LANGUAGE CLASSES AND A LIBRARY. 3. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION OF PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITES BY REASON OF THEIR POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING HTEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 4. TO RELIEVE THE AGED, PARTICULARLY THOSE FROM THE AFGHAN COMMUNITY. 5. TO RELIEVE THE AGED, PARTICULARLY THOSE FROM THE AFGHAN COMMUNITY; AND 5. TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE PUBLIC HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGHS OF HARROW, BRENT, AND EALING
Contact information
- Address:
-
345B Station Road
First floor
HARROW
Middlesex
HA1 2AA
- Phone:
- 02088616990
- Email:
- aalharrow@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window