JAM'IAT IHYAA' MINHAAJ AL-SUNNAH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Muslim religion, to advance education, to relieve poverty and promote such other charitable purpose or purposes as the trustees shall from time to time determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 23 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 February 1997: Standard registration
- J I M A S (Working name)
- JIMAS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohammed Idris WARAICH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Irfan Safdar WARAICH | Trustee | 15 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN GOFUR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 23/01/2020 | 23/01/2021 | 23/01/2022 | 23/01/2023 | 23/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.17k | £56.96k | £66.78k | £35.16k | £19.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.81k | £283.47k | £142.10k | £106.90k | £103.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 23 January 2024 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 January 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 January 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 23 January 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 January 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 23 January 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 January 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 23 January 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 January 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 NOVEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE MUSLIM RELIGION, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 24
IPSWICH
SUFFOLK
IP3 8ED
- Phone:
- 01473251578
- Email:
- mail@jimas.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window