KAISER WILHELM II FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout London
Governance
- 17 February 1997: Standard registration
- 02 February 2007: Removed
- 02 February 2007: Funds transferred to 1117748 The Schroder 1905 Trust
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £123.43k | £159.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.27k | £114.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 28 February 2007 | 28 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 19 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 19 January 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 16 February 2005 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 16 February 2005 | 16 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 27 SEPTEMBER 1996 AND SUBJECT TO A UNITING DIRECTION MADE UNDER S. 96(6) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 DATED 18 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
[A] THE RELIEF GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY OF PERSONS OF GERMAN NATIONALITY, ORIGIN OR DESCENT [AND THEIR DEPENDENTS] WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE FORMER COUNTY OF LONDON OR ELSEWHERE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AND RELIEF IN CASES OF NEED OF PERSONS AS AFORESAID WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED IN INFIRM: I. BY MAKING GRANTS MONEY; 2. BY PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS OR TO ALLEVIATE THEIR SUFFERING OR ASSIST THEIR RECOVERY; 3. BY MAKING ARRANGEMENT FOR SUCH SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO BE PROVIDED FOR THESE PURPOSES BY OTHER INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS (WHETHER IN RETURN FOR DONATIONS OR SUBSCRIPTIONS OUT OF THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY OR NOT) OR 4. BY ANY OTHER APPROPRIATE MEANS OF PROVIDING CHARITABLE ASSISTANCE IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS. [B] THE PROMOTION OF THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS OF GERMAN NATIONALITY, ORIGIN OR DESCENT (AND MORE PARTICULARLY ORPHANS WHO ARE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE) AND PROVIDING IN THE INTERESTS OF THE SOCIAL WELFARE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND MORAL CAPACITIES THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED. [C] THE FURTHERANCE OF THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF GERMAN CHURCHES (AND MORE PARTICULARLY THE GERMAN PROTESTANT CHURCH) IN THE FORMER COUNTY OF LONDON OR ELSEWHERE AND INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL AND OTHER ASSISTANCE TO PASTORS AND THEIR DEPENDENTS.
Area of benefit
THE FORMER COUNTY OF LONDON OR ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window