Financial history THE ROYAL LATIN SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1060724
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £185.15k £420.68k £222.11k £192.89k £46.88k
Total expenditure £92.90k £933.14k £224.69k £65.42k £139.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A