FRIENDS OF THE FORDBRIDGE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The members of the charity are all volunteers and support the day centre serving lunches and being part of meals on wheels team. Centre members take part in many recreational activities to suit their abilities. Subsidised outings are arranged to the seaside and also stately homes etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,800 from 6 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Surrey
Governance
- 18 February 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janice Susan Hutchison | Chair | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Whiteley | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA HUGHES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.94k | £5.50k | £2.53k | £20.34k | £18.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.88k | £4.95k | £1.62k | £12.61k | £13.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 March 2022 | 141 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 December 2020 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 NOVEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED ON 28 JUNE 2007.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE ELDERLY PEOPLE IN NEED RESIDENT IN ASHFORD BY THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
ASHFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Fordbridge Centre
Clarendon Road
ASHFORD
Middlesex
TW15 2QA
- Phone:
- 01784 243809
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.