FAITHLIFT MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian Faith and the relief of poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Mauritius
- United States
Governance
- 20 February 1997: Standard registration
- SOTERIA FAITH MINISTRIES (Working name)
- SOTERIA CHURCH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRUNO AREKION | Trustee | 29 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Krishan Luximon | Trustee | 01 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
REVD GLEN AREKION | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.46k | £56.96k | £60.67k | £60.86k | £76.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.17k | £40.53k | £60.01k | £57.11k | £73.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 March 2025 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 March 2025 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 September 2024 | 215 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
02 September 2024 | 215 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 April 2023 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 April 2023 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 March 2022 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
28 March 2022 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 April 2021 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 April 2021 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21/9/96
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Robinia Road
BROXBOURNE
Hertfordshire
EN10 6GE
- Phone:
- 07912 372342
- Email:
- bruno@faithliftchurch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window