MAKING LADY LEE WORK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 17 February 1997: Standard registration
- 10 October 2006: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 DECEMBER 1996 AS AMMENDED 4 FEBRUARY 1997
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PERSONS RESIDING IN LADYWOOD WARD AND ADJACENT AREAS,IN PARTICULAR THOSE WHO ARE UNEMPLOYED BY THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL GUIDANCE,TRAINING AND EDUCATION THAT WILL ENABLE THEM TO ACCESSTO EMPLOYMENT
Area of benefit
LAYDWOOD WARD OF BIRMINGHAM AND THE ADJACENT DISTRICTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window