Accounts and annual returns SHOPMOBILITY SHREWSBURY

Charity number: 1060788
Charity reporting is overdue by 1220 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 123 days
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 123 days
Annual return 28 February 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 490 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 490 days
Annual return 28 February 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 855 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 855 days
Annual return 28 February 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1220 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1220 days
Annual return 29 February 2020 23 March 2021 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required