THE HOLY TRINITY AND ST.JULIAN RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Financial help with temporary needs as approved by a trustee vote, prioritising people living and/or working within the parish of Holy Trinity Church with St Julian Belle Vue in Shrewsbury, Shropshire or who have some connection to the parish church, it's preschool or toddler's group. The second priority is extended to those living and/or working in Shrewsbury and it's neighbouring villages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Shropshire
Governance
- 18 February 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Fiona Iddon | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Wolton | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Sandra Ann Lloyd | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.82k | £1.74k | £1.80k | £1.84k | £1.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £690 | £0 | £900 | £978 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 29 JANUARY 1997
Charitable objects
IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED,HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS
Area of benefit
THE FORMER MUNICIPAL BOROUGH OF SHREWSBURY AS CONSTITUTED 31 MARCH 1974
Contact information
- Address:
-
Holy Trinity Church
Belle Vue Road
SHREWSBURY
SY3 7LL
- Phone:
- 01743 362399
- Email:
- info@trinitychurches.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window