Accounts and annual returns FELIXSTOWE RESOURCE UNIT SUPPORT GROUP

Charity Number: 1060812
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 May 2018 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 09 February 2017 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 05 November 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required