TRINITY FIELDS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of playing field facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lambeth
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 18 February 1997: Standard registration
- TFT (Working name)
- TRINITY FIELDS LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Farrow-Smith | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Johnson | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Freeman | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Allcock | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JAMES PEGGIE | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARK PETERS | Trustee | 10 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £260.69k | £241.54k | £252.23k | £378.58k | £400.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £184.87k | £212.48k | £345.49k | £483.32k | £392.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | N/A | £13.12k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 22 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 06 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 OCT 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 APR 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06 JUL 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 APR 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 JAN 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 SEP 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (“OBJECTS”) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO PROVIDE IN THE INTEREST OF RECREATION AND SOCIAL WELFARE A PUBLIC RECREATION GROUND AND PLAYING FIELD KNOWN AS TRINITY FIELDS (THE “RECREATION GROUND”) FOR THE USE PRIMARILY OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OR WANDSWORTH AND LAMBETH WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND ALSO, TO THE EXTENT THAT SUCH USE DOES NOT CONFLICT WITH THE PRIMARY USE REFERRED TO ABOVE, FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS GENERALLY OF THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF WANDSWORTH AND LAMBETH
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGHS OF WANDSWORTH AND LAMBETH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Trinity Fields Trust
209 Trinity Road
London
London
England
SW17 7HW
- Phone:
- 02089355049
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window