Trustees TRINITY FIELDS TRUST
Charity number: 1060813
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yvonne Johnson | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ERIK SAMUELSON | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Freeman | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Allcock | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JAMES PEGGIE | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARK PETERS | Trustee | 10 September 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.