LARKHILL GARRISON NURSERY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main objective is enhancement, development and education of children aged 1- 5 yrs. using the EYFS for guidance, and to support parents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 18 February 1997: Standard registration
- 30 July 2014: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 30 July 2014: Funds transferred to 1079392 TNB GARRISON EARLY YEARS AND PLAY
- LARKHILL CAMP PRE-SCHOOL (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £143.26k | £125.17k | £189.66k | £171.80k | £206.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.08k | £117.65k | £158.61k | £173.20k | £190.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 06 June 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | 25 June 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 06 August 2013 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | 11 July 2013 | 11 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | 25 June 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | 28 June 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 04 April 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | 05 April 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/09/1996 AS AMENDED ON 01/09/2008
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELPOMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window