THE CHARNWOOD CHRISTMAS TOY APPEAL

Charity Number: 1060827
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We fund raise to get money to provide new toys, stocking fillers and a selection box for the needy children from birth to 16 years in the Charnwood area. We also provide gifts for the young carers up to 18 years.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £3,182
Total expenditure: £7,806

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 February 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rebecca Ward Trustee 13 June 2024
None on record
Linda Wood Trustee 14 June 2023
None on record
Ian Gerald Townsend Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
Katherine Williams Trustee 01 July 2014
None on record
Vera Williams Trustee 01 November 2013
None on record
Sarah Whittingham Trustee 20 January 2012
None on record
RUTH TOWNSEND Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.74k £7.44k £3.89k £3.57k £3.18k
Total expenditure £10.16k £3.12k £5.67k £7.65k £7.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 03 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
15 Main Street
Grimston
Melton Mowbray
LE14 3BZ
Phone:
07836503250
Website:

No information available