THE ROMANIAN AID FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Romanian Aid Foundation is a UK registered charity providing humanitarian aid to the north-east of Romania. We are working with Romanian people to bring Help to the needy, Hope through the Christian message and Co-operation through joint ventures.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Surrey
- West Sussex
- Romania
Governance
- 19 February 1997: Standard registration
- ROAF (Working name)
- ROAF TECHNICAL SUPPORT (Working name)
- GLIA (GODS LOVE IN ACTION) (Previous name)
- GLIA (GOD'S LOVE IN ACTION) (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CRAIG WARREN BUCHANAN | Trustee | 03 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN GAWN | Trustee | 15 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN FLEGG | Trustee | 12 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROGER KIDD | Trustee | 07 December 2011 |
|
|||||
JANE HEATHER INMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.20k | £15.82k | £23.30k | £12.83k | £15.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.75k | £23.29k | £35.95k | £28.65k | £27.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 15 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TUST DEED DATED 24 JANUARY 1997
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF ROMANIA, INCLUDING RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND CHRISTIAN RELIGION
Area of benefit
ROMANIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
289 COURT LODGE ROAD
HORLEY
SURREY
RH6 8RG
- Phone:
- 07704 861832
- Email:
- info@roaf.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window