Trustees HIGH HALSTOW VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1060866
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GARY STUART THOMAS Chair
None on record
Hazel Sellwood Trustee 10 May 2023
None on record
SUSAN MARGARET WHITEBREAD Trustee 01 May 2023
HIGH HALSTOW WOMENS INSTITUTE
Received: On time
MARGOT STURT Trustee 10 May 2016
None on record
Christine Janet Peek Trustee 10 June 2015
None on record
Wenda Cordel Taylor Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record
Raymond Collins Trustee 10 May 2009
None on record
GEORGE JOSIAH THOMAS CROZER Trustee
None on record