Accounts and annual returns PRESTWOOD JUNIOR SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1060881
Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 06 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 06 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 18 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 18 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 18 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 18 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 19 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 19 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window