Trustees DORSET COMMUNITY ACTION

Charity number: 1060910
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Donald Nordberg Trustee 08 March 2025
None on record
Robert Watt Trustee 02 September 2024
None on record
Dr Rebecca Savory Fuller Trustee 02 September 2024
None on record
Jeffrey Hart Trustee 29 June 2023
None on record
Aimie Cole Trustee 25 February 2021
None on record
Christopher Spackman Trustee 31 October 2019
None on record