LITTLE DEERS DAY NURSERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide Day Nursery care and learning for children from 3 months up to school age
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 25 February 1997: Standard registration
- BURLEY MOTHER AND TODDLER PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- LITTLE DEERS PRE-SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katherine Ash | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simon Johnson | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Empson | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Brunton | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Fuller | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Ghirardello | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Griffiths | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £140.11k | £155.26k | £183.58k | £213.53k | £248.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £173.44k | £149.63k | £200.58k | £202.81k | £230.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £49.70k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 02 February 2025 | 217 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 02 February 2025 | 217 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 April 2023 | 298 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 April 2023 | 298 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 August 2021 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 August 2021 | 55 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 09 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 09 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06/02/1995 AS AMENDED ON 01/09/2009 AS AMENDED ON 12/11/2012
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
DEER HALL
RINGWOOD ROAD
BURLEY
RINGWOOD
BH24 4BU
- Phone:
- 01425404167
- Email:
- treasurer@littledeers.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window