FRAMEWORK HOUSING ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Framework exists to meet the needs of homeless and vulnerable people by providing outreach, accommodation, support, treatment, care, training, resettlement and tenancy sustainment services. The service user group includes people with drug, alcohol and mental health problems and those with complex needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£57,446,000
Donations and legacies | £689.00k | |
Charitable activities | £54.08m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £2.68m |
Total expenditure:
£56,129,000
Raising funds | £290.00k | |
Charitable activities | £55.84m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £30,297,000 from 56 government contract(s) and £619,000 from 75 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £290.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £55.84m | |
Retained for future use | £1.32m |
People

905 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
114 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 3 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 25 February 1997: Standard registration
- 08 December 2021: Funds received from 1161309 NOTTINGHAMSHIRE HOMELESS EYECARE
- MACEDON (Previous name)
- MACEDON & NHHA (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Hawkins | Chair | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Bethea | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Jackson | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Neil Duncan Jones | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rob John Main | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prof Marcus Beale | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prof Brigitte Elfriede Scammell | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prof Sheona Mary MacLeod | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Olumo Davies | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Tipping | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Holly Davis | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Mary Arkley | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Harris | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.32m | £47.53m | £50.51m | £55.85m | £57.45m | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.50m | £45.29m | £49.40m | £55.29m | £56.13m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £21.20m | £21.94m | £23.79m | £27.91m | £30.30m | |
|
Income from government grants | £552.00k | £508.00k | £555.00k | £602.00k | £619.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £633.00k | £997.00k | £762.00k | £1.07m | £689.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £42.73m | £43.94m | £46.79m | £50.74m | £54.08m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £74.00k | £5.00k | £1.00k | £50.00k | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £1.88m | £2.59m | £2.95m | £4.00m | £2.68m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £67.78k | £7.05k | £243.23k | £16.44k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £44.33m | £45.10m | £49.15m | £54.99m | £55.84m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £174.00k | £196.00k | £253.00k | £300.00k | £290.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £24.92k | £26.00k | £27.74k | £35.44k | £36.95k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £61.78m | £66.29m | £73.95m | £77.33m | £79.88m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £14.41m | £12.90m | £12.62m | £11.03m | £9.72m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£1.13m | -£2.09m | -£1.82m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £50.71m | £51.37m | £57.49m | £58.57m | £58.48m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/02/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/03/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/04/2001 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19/07/2001 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24/12/2001 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/07/2011
Charitable objects
(A) TO HOUSE, TREAT, REHABILITATE, EDUCATE, TRAIN AND CARE FOR PERSONS IN NEED WHO ARE HOMELESS (OR THREATENED WITH THE PROSPECT OF BECOMING HOMELESS) AND / OR SUFFERING FROM THE EFFECTS OF POVERTY, SICKNESS, DISABILITY, OLD AGE, ALCOHOLISM, DRUG ADDICTION, OFFENDING BEHAVIOUR OR ANY OTHER MENTAL OR PHYSICAL INFIRMITY; (B) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, RESOURCES AND SERVICES TO SUPPORT AND / OR BENEFIT PERSONS IN NEED WHO ARE HOMELESS (OR THREATENED WITH THE PROSPECT OF BECOMING HOMELESS) AND / OR SUFFERING FROM THE EFFECTS OF POVERTY, SICKNESS, DISABILITY, OLD AGE, ALCOHOLISM, DRUG ADDITION, OFFENDING BEHAVIOUR OR ANY OTHER MENTAL OR PHYSICAL INFIRMITY; (C) THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE OR IMPROVEMENT OF PROPERTIES FOR THE HOUSING, TREATMENT, REHABILITATION, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND CARE OF PERSONS IN NEED WHO ARE HOMELESS (OR THREATENED WITH THE PROSPECT OF BECOMING HOMELESS) AND / OR SUFFERING FROM THE EFFECTS OF POVERTY, SICKNESS, DISABILITY, OLD AGE, ALCOHOLISM, DRUG ADDITION, OFFENDING BEHAVIOUR OR ANY OTHER MENTAL OR PHYSICAL INFIRMITY (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE OR IMPROVEMENT OF A PUBLIC AMENITY IN THE VICINITY OF A LANDFILL SITE WHERE IT IS FOR THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT); AND (D)TO PROMOTE FURTHER STUDY OF THE NATURE, EXTENT AND CONSEQUENCES OF THE SAID SOCIAL PROBLEMS SET OUT ABOVE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
VAL ROBERTS HOUSE
25 GREGORY BOULEVARD
NOTTINGHAM
NG7 6NX
- Phone:
- 01158417711
- Email:
- webenquiries@frameworkha.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window