THE CITY COMMUNITY CHURCH (EXETER) CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1060985
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The stated objects of the Trust are: "the promotion and advancement of Christian religion and the worship of God and the spreading of the Gospel of the Lord Jesus Christ"

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £57,314
Total expenditure: £54,977

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 February 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • CCC (Working name)
  • CITY COMMUNITY CHURCH (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ben Richards Chair 24 September 2018
DEVON CHRISTIAN YOUTH CAMPS TRUST
Received: On time
Sally Wilson Trustee 16 January 2023
None on record
John Chamberlain Trustee 16 January 2023
None on record
Russell LePuill Trustee 27 January 2021
None on record
Nia Morrish Trustee 25 June 2020
None on record
Tom Morrish Trustee 25 June 2020
YMCA CENTRES (SOUTH MOLTON)
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £54.17k £49.44k £53.67k £51.37k £57.31k
Total expenditure £54.01k £48.07k £50.39k £56.48k £54.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.06k £5.81k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 13 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 13 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 25 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 25 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
13 Cleveland Street
EXETER
EX4 1BB
Phone:
07814044543