NORTH WARWICKSHIRE PRIMARY CARE TRUST GENERAL CHARITY

Charity number: 1060988
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To apply income, and at their discretion, so far as may be permissible, the capital, for any charitable purpose or purposes relating to the National Health Service wholly or mainly for Warwickshire Primary Care Trust (the PCT).

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011

Total income: £32,000
Total expenditure: £30,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City
  • Coventry City
  • Dudley
  • Sandwell
  • Solihull
  • Walsall
  • Warwickshire
  • Wolverhampton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 February 1997: Standard registration
  • 06 September 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • NORTH WARWICKSHIRE NHS TRUST GENERAL CHARITY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £30.00k £30.00k £34.00k £33.00k £32.00k
Total expenditure £66.00k £60.00k £26.00k £25.00k £30.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not submitted

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27/1/97 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 28/2/2003
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE WHOLLY OR MAINLY FOR SERVICES PROVIDED BY NORTH WARWICKSHIRE PRIMARY CARE TRUST AT BRAMCOTE HOSPITAL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 27 February 1997 : Standard registration
  • 06 September 2023 : Removed