Financial history RUSHEY GREEN SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1060996
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £8.86k £11.31k £4.93k £6.23k £8.01k
Total expenditure £6.86k £3.86k £2.32k £6.00k £12.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A