ST RAPHAEL CLUB OF BRENTWOOD [ FOR THE PHYSICALLY DISABLED]
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides facilities for recreation or other leisure time occupation for physically disabled adults in the Brentwood area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 07 March 1997: Standard registration
- 24 January 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 24 January 2023: Funds transferred to 1000785 BRENTWOOD STROKE CLUB
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.39k | £2.34k | £3.48k | £2.42k | £440 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.91k | £2.64k | £2.03k | £1.32k | £28 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 22 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27/6/94, (AS AMENDED 18/2/97)
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF PHYSICALLY DISABLED ADULTS IN THE BRENTWOOD AREA PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
BRENTWOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window