Financial history SERBIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH OF HOLY TRINITY, BRADFORD

Charity number: 1061038
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £52.23k £40.30k £47.32k £53.99k £66.09k
Total expenditure £48.60k £40.48k £37.65k £57.05k £52.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A