Accounts and annual returns THE ACTORS CENTRE NORTH LIMITED

Charity Number: 1061041
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 26 July 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 30 July 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2011 15 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 15 September 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 29 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 20 August 2010 On Time