JOHN SCHOFIELD TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support the professional development of talented young broadcast and online journalists with fewer than five years' experience, through the provision of an annual award and a mentoring scheme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
190 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 05 March 1997: Standard registration
- THE JOHN SCHOFIELD MEMORIAL TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Markus Ickstadt | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Phipps | Trustee | 13 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fergus Bell | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ayshah Tull | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rob Osborne | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Murphy | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Paterson | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Shaunagh Connaire | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Holly Irwin | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sunita Bhatti | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
SUSANNAH SCHOFIELD | Trustee | 05 March 1997 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.09k | £94.30k | £82.28k | £139.25k | £144.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.12k | £61.85k | £117.79k | £129.78k | £129.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 OCT 1996 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 06 JAN 1997 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 16 JUN 2011 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 06 OCT 2017 as amended on 20 Sep 2022 as amended on 12 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND SOCIAL DIVERSITY IN JOURNALISM
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 108
HASLEMERE
UNITED KINGDOM
GU27 9GU
- Phone:
- 07512187605
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window