YMCA Walsall

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As a subsidiary of YMCA Black Country Group, the vision is of an inclusive Christian Movement, transforming communities, so that all young people truly belong, contribute and thrive. We fulfil this vision through supported housing for homeless young people in areas of deprivation and healthy living services which promote well being and community learning activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£714,540
Donations and legacies | £41.63k | |
Charitable activities | £672.91k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£695,281
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £695.28k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £34,450 from 1 government contract(s) and £90,000 from 4 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £695.28k | |
Retained for future use | £19.26k |
People

13 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 05 March 1997: Standard registration
- FIRST BASE WALSALL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeremy OAKLEY | Chair | 17 November 2020 |
|
|||||||
Clotilda Tigere | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|||||||
Ramesh Kumar MALHAN | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|||||||
Geoffrey Stonyer | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|||||||
Stephanie Paula PATRICK | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|||||||
Jayne Alison SARGEANT | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|||||||
Mark Allan FUSSELL | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|||||||
JONATHAN ROBERT ROWE | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|||||||
Martin James SHENTON | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|||||||
Pauline TOMLINSON | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|||||||
Philip WALKER | Trustee | 19 May 2020 |
|
|||||||
MISS ANNE-MARIE GILLESPIE | Trustee | 07 August 2018 |
|
|||||||
OLASEINDE BALOGUN | Trustee | 07 August 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £583.30k | £691.99k | £581.46k | £683.38k | £714.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £649.73k | £584.95k | £612.00k | £711.02k | £695.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £169.27k | N/A | N/A | £35.00k | £34.45k | |
|
Income from government grants | £74.63k | £83.07k | £96.30k | £75.00k | £90.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £9.91k | £11.59k | £34.10k | £3.21k | £41.63k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £573.39k | £672.34k | £546.06k | £680.18k | £672.91k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £8.07k | £1.30k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £649.73k | £584.95k | £612.00k | £711.02k | £695.28k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £2.85k | £2.45k | £2.80k | £3.11k | £3.84k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £559.09k | £554.37k | £542.00k | £522.73k | £523.14k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £144.48k | £114.66k | £155.58k | £149.07k | £233.53k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £227.36k | £85.79k | £144.88k | £146.73k | £212.33k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 NOVEMBER 1996. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12 FEBRUARY 1997. AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 5 JULY 2000. as amended on 26 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE POVERTY OF YOUNG HOMELESS PERSONS IN WALSALL, PRINCIPALLY IN THE AREAS OF ST MATTHEWS, PALFREY AND PLECK, WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS , IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF TEMPORARY ACCOMMODATION, TRAINING AND SUPPORT WHICH INTEGRATES THEM INTO THE COMMUNITY 2)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF SUCH PERSONS 3) TO PROVIDE A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH PERSONS AND THE LOCAL COMMUNITY, PROVIDING TRAINING AND EDUCATION, AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID PERSONS AND LOCAL COMMUNITY, AND INTEGRATING THE SAID PERSONS INTO THE LOCAL COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
WALSALL, PRINCIPALLY IN THE AREAS OF ST MATTHEWS, PALFREY AND PLECK
Contact information
- Address:
-
YMCA
Tramway Drive
Wolverhampton
WV2 1BJ
- Phone:
- 01902371550
- Email:
- info@ymcabc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window