CHRISTIAN DISCIPLES CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sunday Worship : Every Sunday 11:00am-12:15pm
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 05 March 1997: Standard registration
- LIVERPOOL CHINESE CHRISTIAN DISCIPLES CHURCH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Grace Hew-Yan Chan | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Albert Shu-Yen Hsu | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mei Yim Olive Chan | Trustee | 11 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev Calvin Shiu Wah Chan | Trustee | 07 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev KA HANG LEONG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.11k | £28.21k | £24.74k | £42.47k | £44.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.35k | £30.57k | £37.02k | £41.28k | £41.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 25 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 25 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 JANUARY 1996 AS AMENDED 18 FEBRUARY 1997. CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 07/01/2015
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIANITY BY: 1.THE WORSHIP OF GOD. 2.THE TEACHING OF SCRIPTURES AND THE DISCIPLING OF CHRISTIANS AT LAY AND/OR FULL-TIME LEVELS. 3.THE FELLOWSHIP OF COMMITTED CHRISTIANS. 4.THE PREACHING OF THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 Chancellor Court
LIVERPOOL
L8 7BD
- Phone:
- 07847518207
- Email:
- liverpoolcdc.uk@gmail.com
- Website:
-
liverpool.christiandiscipleschurch.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window