Financial history GRACE CHARISMATIC CENTRE

Charity number: 1061096
Charity reporting is up to date (24 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/03/2020 30/03/2021 30/03/2022 30/03/2023 30/03/2024
Total gross income £58.56k £45.65k £73.83k £69.64k £47.83k
Total expenditure £58.77k £38.38k £42.65k £64.61k £47.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.66k N/A N/A N/A